Governors
SCHOOL BOARD OF GOVERNORS FOR THE ACADEMIC YEAR 203/24
Welcome to our School Governors Page on which we introduce you to our School Governors. By clicking on each Governor's name, below each photograph, you will be able to read a 'pen portrait' of each member of our School Board of Trustees.
Sian Turner as Chair is pending ratification.
Co-opted Governor |
Ian Sadler Vice Chair of Governors |
Mark Bellamy Headteacher |
Julie Williams Co-opted Governor |
Johanna Ashworth-Jones Parent Governor |
Julie |
Rose |
Julie |
Laura Wilson Parent Governor |
Co-opted Governor |
Governor
|
Co-opted |
Clerk to GovernorS |
Steve Ledson Parent Governor |
Chair of Board of Governors | ||||
Ian Sadler | IS | Vice Chair of Board of Governors | Community Governor | Link for Curriculum and Exams |
Mark Bellamy | MBE | Ex-Officio Governor | Headteacher | |
Sian Turner | ST | Chair of Finance Committee | Co-opted Governor | Link for Financial Leadership |
Johanna Ashworth-Jones | JA | Governor | Parent Governor | Link for Student Achievement |
Julie Money | JM | Governor | Co-opted Governor | Link for Safeguarding |
Julie Griffiths | JG | Governor | Parent Governor | Link for Post-16 Education |
Rose Owen | RO | Governor | Co-opted Governor | Link for Behaviour and Attendance |
Julie Williams | JW | Governor | Co-opted Governor | Link for Teaching and Learning |
Julie Morris | JM | Governor | Co-opted Governor | Link for Student Personal Development |
Laura Wilson | LW | Governor | Co-opted Governor | Link for Premises and ICT |
Paul Hindle | PH | Governor | Co-opted Governor | Link for Student Personal Development |
Helen Johnson | HJ | Governor | Co-opted Governor | |
Steve Ledson | SL | Governor | Parent Governor | Link for Well-Being |
Wendy Collyer | WC | Clerk to Board of Governors |
Governors can be contacted, through our Clerk to Governors, using the school address or phone number.
Hilbre High School Humanities College – Term of Office and Registered Interests: 2021-22
Name |
Particular Nature of Interest (Business, Financial, Material) |
Start of Term of Office |
End of Term of Office |
---|---|---|---|
Mr Mike Cockburn |
Employed by Wirral LA. Parent of a Hilbre student. |
01/09/2021 |
31/08/2024 |
Anthony Bassett | 01/07/2021 | 30/04/2024 | |
Greg Kemp |
01/07/2020 | 30/04/2024 | |
Nic Harrison | 01/07/2021 | 30/04/2024 | |
Ian Sadler |
Employed by Liverpool JMU University Parent of a Hilbre Student |
01/09/2021 | 31/08/2025 |
Mark Bellamy | Headteacher of the school | 01/09/2015 | |
Gill Williams | Employee of South Wirral High School | 01/09/2021 | 19/09/2023 |
Sian Turner | Employee of United Learning Multi Academy Trust | 13/11/2019 | 12/11/2024 |
Johanna Ashworth-Jones | Parent of a Hilbre student | 01/12/2019 | 30/11/2024 |
Julie Money | Now retired employee of Liverpool University | 20/09/2018 | 19/09/2024 |
Julie Griffiths | Parent of a Hilbre student | 13/11/2019 | 12/11/2024 |
Rose Owen | Employed by Wirral Council - Managed Moves Section - 2006 | 17/03/2020 | 16/03/2024 |
Julie Williams |
No declarations |
07/12/2020 | 06/12/2024 |
Laura Wilson | 04/10/2021 | 03/10/2025 | |
Steve Ledson | Link Governor for Well-being | 04/10/2021 | 03/10/2025 |
Paul Hindle | Link for Student Personal Development | 24/04/2022 | 23/04/2026 |
Julie Morris | Link for Student Personal Development | 24/04/2022 | 23/04/2026 |
Helen Johnson | Co-Opted Governor | 12/11/2023 | 19/09/2024 |
Governor | Named business &/or personal interests with school - (spouse/relative). Roles in other educational establishments as at autumn 2023 |
Mike Cockburn | None |
Mark Bellamy | Headteacher of the school |
Ian Sadler | Employee of Liverpool John Moores University since Jan 2017 |
Sian Turner | Employee of United Learning Multi Academy Trust from Oct 2018 to August 2023 and Employee of Co op Academies Trust since September 2023 |
Johanna Ashworth-Jones | None |
Steve Ledson | Employee of Foxfield School since Sept 2007 Wife works at Hilbre High School since September 2006 |
Julie Money | None |
Julie Griffiths | Husband is a governor at Holy Trinity School Hoylake since Sept 2019 |
Rosemary Owen | Governor at Woodchurch High School since December 2021 |
Julie Williams | |
Laura Wilson | Dealings with Dalkia through employment since November 2015. Dealings with Chartwells Catering through employment since November 2015. Parent of student at the school |
Paul Hindle | Headteacher - Black Horse Hill Junior School |
Julie Morris | Headteacher - Black Horse Hill Infants School |
Helen Johnson |